ID H0577 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CANNABIDIOL OIL -- Adds to existing law to provide an exemption for lawful use and possession of cannabidiol oil.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide an exemption for lawful use and possession of cannabidiol oil.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2018-03-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-28Houseto Senate
2018-02-28HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-11-0
2018-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback