ID H0575 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2024 Session Law Chapter 105 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DISCLOSING EXPLICIT SYNTHETIC MEDIA -- Adds to existing law to provide for the crime of disclosing explicit synthetic media.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for the crime of disclosing explicit synthetic media.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2024 Session Law Chapter 105 Effective: 07/01/2024
2024-03-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 15, 2024
2024-03-15HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2024-03-14SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2024-03-14SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2024-03-14HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2024-03-13HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2024-03-13Senateto House
2024-03-13SenateTitle apvd
2024-03-13SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2024-03-12SenateRetained on calendar
2024-03-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2024-03-04SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2024-02-28SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2024-02-28SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2024-02-27Houseto Senate
2024-02-27HouseTitle apvd
2024-02-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4
2024-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2024-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2024-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2024-02-16HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2024-02-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback