ID H0575 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE DESSERT -- Adds to existing law to designate the huckleberry pie as the state dessert of Idaho.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to designate the huckleberry pie as the state dessert of Idaho.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseU.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback