ID H0570 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Idaho Code section 72-1104(1)(c) only
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Idaho Code section 72-1104(1)(c) only
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Peace Officer and Detention Officer Temporary Disability Act to revise provisions relating to compensation and costs.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Peace Officer and Detention Officer Temporary Disability Act to revise provisions relating to compensation and costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Idaho Code section 72-1104(1)(c) only | |
2012-03-29 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 186 Effective: 07/01/12; 07/01/15 Sunset Clause | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/23 | |
2012-03-23 | To Governor | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-20 | to House | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to Jud | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-05 | to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2012-03-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-29 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to Transp | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-21 | to printing | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | House intro |