ID H0568 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2018 Session Law Chapter 238 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INITIATIVES AND REFERENDA -- Amends, repeals and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding initiative or referendum elections, to provide that certain initiative and referendum procedures shall not apply to any local zoning legislation and to provide that counties shall follow certain procedures for an initiative and referendum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends, repeals and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding initiative or referendum elections, to provide that certain initiative and referendum procedures shall not apply to any local zoning legislation and to provide that counties shall follow certain procedures for an initiative and referendum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2018 Session Law Chapter 238 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:28 p.m. on March 19, 2018
2018-03-19HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-19SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-19SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-16HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-16HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-15Senateto House
2018-03-15SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-15SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 27-7-1
2018-03-14SenateRetained on calendar
2018-03-13SenateRetained on calendar
2018-03-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-09SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-26Houseto Senate
2018-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 57-10-3
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Local Government
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback