ID H0566 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - to Loc Gov
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - to Loc Gov
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to increase the amount that can be contributed to a medical savings account and health savings account and deducted for state income tax purposes.
Title
Amends existing law to increase the amount that can be contributed to a medical savings account and health savings account and deducted for state income tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-03-12 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-12 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-09 | to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-09 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 66-1-3 | |
2012-03-08 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-06 | to engros | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-05 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-29 | Ret'd to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-29 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-21 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-21 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-20 | to printing | |
2012-02-20 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-20 | House intro |