ID H0563 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Sunday, April 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEALTH CARE -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise a code reference and to establish provisions regarding Plan First Idaho.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to revise a code reference and to establish provisions regarding Plan First Idaho.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Sunday, April 1, 2018
2018-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Wednesday, March 21, 2018
2018-03-06HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback