ID H0561 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INCOME TAXES -- Amends existing law to to provide for an automatic reduction in individual and corporate income tax rates upon the occurrence of certain revenue growth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to to provide for an automatic reduction in individual and corporate income tax rates upon the occurrence of certain revenue growth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-02-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-20Houseto Senate
2018-02-20HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 48-20-1
2018-02-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-16HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback