ID H0561 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXES -- Amends existing law to to provide for an automatic reduction in individual and corporate income tax rates upon the occurrence of certain revenue growth.
Title
Amends existing law to to provide for an automatic reduction in individual and corporate income tax rates upon the occurrence of certain revenue growth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-20 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 48-20-1 |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |