ID H0560 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2020 Session Law Chapter 313 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY -- Amends existing law to provide for the valuation of agricultural land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for the valuation of agricultural land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2020 Session Law Chapter 313 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on March 19, 2020
2020-03-19HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-19SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-19SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-19HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-19Houseto enrol
2020-03-19HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-19HouseRules Suspended:
2020-03-19HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-19HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2020-03-19HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2020-03-19HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2020-03-19HouseReturned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
2020-03-18Senateto House
2020-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-18SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 30-2-3
2020-03-18SenateRead in full as required)
2020-03-18SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2020-03-18SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-18SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-03-18SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2020-03-18SenateAmendments ordered printed
2020-03-18SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-03-18SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2020-03-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-03-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-03-04SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2020-03-04SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-03-02Houseto Senate
2020-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-02HouseRules Suspended:
2020-02-28HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback