ID H0560 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BOND ELECTIONS -- Adds to existing law to provide language to be placed on the ballot in a bond election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide language to be placed on the ballot in a bond election.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseU.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
2018-02-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-16HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback