ID H0559 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 194 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY TAXATION -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for a provisional property tax exemption for property that is under construction for a tax-exempt purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for a provisional property tax exemption for property that is under construction for a tax-exempt purpose.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 194 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2016
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 16, 2018
2018-03-16HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-15HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-14Senateto House
2018-03-14SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-14SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-13SenateRetained on calendar
2018-03-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-09SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-02-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-20Houseto Senate
2018-02-20HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-2-0
2018-02-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-16HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback