ID H0557 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2020 Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/11/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2020 Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/11/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- OMNIBUS -- Reduces appropriations for fiscal year 2020.
Title
Reduces appropriations for fiscal year 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2020 Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/11/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 29-1-5 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-2-12 |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |