ID H0555 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COUNTY JUSTICE FUND -- Amends existing law to revise the tax levy rate on property for a county justice fund.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the tax levy rate on property for a county justice fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2018-02-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 27-41-2 |
2018-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |