ID H0549 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2018 Session Law Chapter 75 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2018 Session Law Chapter 75 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND GAME -- Adds to existing law to provide for the salvage of certain animals unintentionally struck and killed by a vehicle on a roadway, to provide that certain severely injured animals may be dispatched, to provide reporting requirements and to provide exceptions to applicability.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the salvage of certain animals unintentionally struck and killed by a vehicle on a roadway, to provide that certain severely injured animals may be dispatched, to provide reporting requirements and to provide exceptions to applicability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2018 Session Law Chapter 75 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on March 9, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-1 |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |