ID H0546 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 60 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 60 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to create the Global Entrepreneurial Mission Grant Fund and to provide for a transfer of moneys from the fund.
Title
Adds to existing law to create the Global Entrepreneurial Mission Grant Fund and to provide for a transfer of moneys from the fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 60 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/12 | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-08 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-07 | To enrol | |
2012-03-06 | to House | |
2012-03-06 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-06 | Cameron & Goedde | |
2012-03-06 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 30-4-1 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McKenzie, Mortimer, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Werk NAYS -- McKague, Nuxoll, Pearce, Vick Absent and excused -- Winder Floor Sponsors | |
2012-03-05 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-28 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-28 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-27 | to Senate | |
2012-02-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-27 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 63-2-5 | |
2012-02-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-02-15 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-14 | to printing | |
2012-02-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-14 | House intro |