ID H0545 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CHARTER SCHOOLS -- Repeals and adds to existing law to remove the Public Charter School Debt Reserve Fund and to provide for a revolving loan fund.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to remove the Public Charter School Debt Reserve Fund and to provide for a revolving loan fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-17 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-1-1 |
2022-02-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |