ID H0541 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to prohibit economic credentialing of medical staff membership in health care organizations.
Title
Adds to existing law to prohibit economic credentialing of medical staff membership in health care organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/22 | |
2012-03-22 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-20 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-19 | To enrol | |
2012-03-16 | to House | |
2012-03-16 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-29 | to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2012-02-28 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-15 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-14 | to printing | |
2012-02-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-14 | House intro |