ID H0540 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

LICENSE PLATES -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for Idaho Humane Society's pet friendly license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for Idaho Humane Society's pet friendly license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2018-03-12HouseReconsidered -- FAILED 31-32-7
2018-03-12Housemotion carried
2018-03-12HouseMotion to reconsider
2018-03-12HouseHeld at Desk
2018-03-12HouseNotice to reconsider
2018-03-12HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2018-03-12HouseRead third time in full as amended -- FAILED 31-31-8
2018-03-09HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2018-03-08HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-03-07HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-03-07HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2018-03-07HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2018-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-23HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback