ID H0540 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 103 Effective: 01/01/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 103 Effective: 01/01/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to motor vehicle financial responsibility to provide for the online insurance verification system, to exempt certain information from disclosure, to require that peace officers access certain information from such system and to grant the Idaho Transportation Department rulemaking authority.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to motor vehicle financial responsibility to provide for the online insurance verification system, to exempt certain information from disclosure, to require that peace officers access certain information from such system and to grant the Idaho Transportation Department rulemaking authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 103 Effective: 01/01/14 | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/16 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-15 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-14 | To enrol | |
2012-03-13 | to House | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2012-03-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | to Transp | |
2012-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-29 | to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-29 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2012-02-28 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt engros | |
2012-02-24 | to engros | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-02-23 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Transp | |
2012-02-15 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-14 | to printing | |
2012-02-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-14 | House intro |