ID H0534 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BAIL ENFORCEMENT AGENTS -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide requirements for bail enforcement agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide requirements for bail enforcement agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseReturned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2018-03-12SenateRet’d to House
2018-03-12SenateRead third time in full -- FAILED 14-21-0
2018-03-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-23SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-02-23SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-22Houseto Senate
2018-02-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 38-28-3
2018-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback