ID H0534 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - November 2012, if Ch.97, Laws of 2011, is rejected through voter referendum in General Election
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - November 2012, if Ch.97, Laws of 2011, is rejected through voter referendum in General Election
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to certain leadership awards.
Title
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to certain leadership awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | November 2012, if Ch.97, Laws of 2011, is rejected through voter referendum in General Election | |
2012-03-14 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 70 Effective: 07/01/12; Sunset Clause | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/12 | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-08 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-07 | To enrol | |
2012-03-06 | to House | |
2012-03-06 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-06 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-05 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-24 | to Educ | |
2012-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-24 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-23 | to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2012-02-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-21 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-21 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-21 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Educ | |
2012-02-15 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-14 | to printing | |
2012-02-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-14 | House intro |