ID H0531 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH -- Amends existing law to provide that prescription drug orders for medication-assisted treatment may be issued using telehealth services.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that prescription drug orders for medication-assisted treatment may be issued using telehealth services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-02 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4 |
2020-02-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |