ID H0531 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOL -- Amends existing law to limited immunity to minors seeking or needing emergency medical assistance.
Title
Amends existing law to limited immunity to minors seeking or needing emergency medical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-3 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |