ID H0530 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2014 Session Law Chapter 113 Effective: 03/18/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2014 Session Law Chapter 113 Effective: 03/18/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide that the state use tax shall not apply to donations of food or beverages, or both, to individuals or nonprofit organizations and to define a "nonprofit organization" as those nonprofit entities currently registered with the Secretary of State.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the state use tax shall not apply to donations of food or beverages, or both, to individuals or nonprofit organizations and to define a "nonprofit organization" as those nonprofit entities currently registered with the Secretary of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2014 Session Law Chapter 113 Effective: 03/18/2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-28 | House | PASSED -- 67-0-3 |
2014-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |