ID H0528 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - U.C. to be returned to Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - U.C. to be returned to Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to establish provisions relating to a school safety plan; to revise provisions relating to the Public School Income Fund, to revise provisions relating to uses of an appropriation and to provide for a deposit to the fund.
Title
Amends existing law to establish provisions relating to a school safety plan; to revise provisions relating to the Public School Income Fund, to revise provisions relating to uses of an appropriation and to provide for a deposit to the fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | U.C. to be returned to Education Committee |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0528.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0528.pdf |