ID H0525 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2016 Session Law Chapter 285 Effective: 03/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

DOGS - Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the regulation of dangerous or at-risk dogs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the regulation of dangerous or at-risk dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2016 Session Law Chapter 285 Effective: 03/30/2016
2016-03-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 22, 2016
2016-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2016-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2016-03-18HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2016-03-17HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2016-03-16Senateto House
2016-03-16SenateTitle apvd
2016-03-16SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2016-03-16SenateRead third time in full
2016-03-16SenateRetained on calendar
2016-03-11SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2016-03-10SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2016-03-03SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs
2016-03-03SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2016-03-02Houseto Senate
2016-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2016-03-02HousePASSED -- 70-0-0
2016-03-02HouseRead third time in full as amended
2016-03-01HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2016-02-29HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2016-02-29HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2016-02-26HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2016-02-26HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2016-02-26HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2016-02-26HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2016-02-25HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2016-02-22HouseReported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2016-02-19HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback