ID H0523 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BAIL -- Amends existing law to provide that certain notice shall be sent to the surety insurance company and to provide that failure to provide notice will exonerate the bail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that certain notice shall be sent to the surety insurance company and to provide that failure to provide notice will exonerate the bail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-02Houseto Senate
2018-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-02HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-16-3
2018-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback