ID H0522 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 182 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 182 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide for prohibited uses of public assistance benefit cards by recipients, to provide for businesses that must ensure compliance with the provisions of this section, to authorize the department to notify a licensing authority if a business does not comply with this section, to provide that only a recipient or authorized user can use a public assistance benefit card, to require the department to provide notice to recipients, to provide for a penalty, to define terms and to provide for enforcement.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for prohibited uses of public assistance benefit cards by recipients, to provide for businesses that must ensure compliance with the provisions of this section, to authorize the department to notify a licensing authority if a business does not comply with this section, to provide that only a recipient or authorized user can use a public assistance benefit card, to require the department to provide notice to recipients, to provide for a penalty, to define terms and to provide for enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 182 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/23 | |
2012-03-23 | To Governor | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-20 | to House | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-29 | to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-29 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 64-0-6 | |
2012-02-28 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt engros | |
2012-02-24 | to engros | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-02-22 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-13 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-02-13 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-10 | to printing | |
2012-02-10 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-10 | House intro |