ID H0522 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 138 Effective: 03/29/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 138 Effective: 03/29/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to out-of-state emergency responders to define terms and to provide provisions relating to liability of out-of-state emergency responders who enter this state in response to an emergency; to provide that provisions relating to authorized emergency and police vehicles and liability shall apply to certain drivers of authorized emergency or police vehicles of other states.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to out-of-state emergency responders to define terms and to provide provisions relating to liability of out-of-state emergency responders who enter this state in response to an emergency; to provide that provisions relating to authorized emergency and police vehicles and liability shall apply to certain drivers of authorized emergency or police vehicles of other states.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 138 Effective: 03/29/10 | |
2010-03-24 | To Governor | |
2010-03-23 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-22 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-19 | To enrol | |
2010-03-18 | to House | |
2010-03-18 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-02 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-02 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-01 | to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 64-0-6 | |
2010-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-12 | to St Aff | |
2010-02-12 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-11 | to printing | |
2010-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-11 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0522.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0522.pdf |