ID H0519 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2014 Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2014 Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide for the use of restraints against the medical advice of a licensed physician.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the use of restraints against the medical advice of a licensed physician.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2014 Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-1-1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-03 | House | Rusche |
2014-03-03 | House | 61-6-3 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Loertscher, Malek, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Batt, Boyle, Gestrin, Luker, McDonald, Palmer Absent -- Anderson(01), Kloc, Nielsen Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-03 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-03 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2014-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |