ID H0519 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Law without signature Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Law without signature Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to site improvements to provide that certain site improvements that are associated with land are exempt from property tax.
Title
Amends existing law relating to site improvements to provide that certain site improvements that are associated with land are exempt from property tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Law without signature Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 01/01/12 | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/23 | |
2012-03-23 | To Governor | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-20 | to House | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 28-7-0 | |
2012-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-24 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-24 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-23 | to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 57-12-1 | |
2012-02-20 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-17 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-13 | to Rev/Tax | |
2012-02-13 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-10 | to printing | |
2012-02-10 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-10 | House intro |