ID H0517 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLE RENTALS -- Adds to existing law to limit regulation of motor vehicle rentals and vehicle rental marketplaces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to limit regulation of motor vehicle rentals and vehicle rental marketplaces.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2018-02-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 20-48-2
2018-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback