ID H0516 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 115 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 115 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide that fees allowed for issuing warrants of distraint, collection, levy and return of the same shall be set by ordinance by the Board of County Commissioners.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that fees allowed for issuing warrants of distraint, collection, levy and return of the same shall be set by ordinance by the Board of County Commissioners.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 115 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-22 | To Governor | |
2010-03-19 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-18 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-18 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-17 | To enrol | |
2010-03-16 | to House | |
2010-03-16 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2010-03-05 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-04 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-04 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-26 | to Loc Gov | |
2010-02-26 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-26 | Senate intro | |
2010-02-25 | to Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-25 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2010-02-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-19 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-19 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-19 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-12 | to Loc Gov | |
2010-02-12 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-11 | to printing | |
2010-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-11 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0516.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0516.pdf |