ID H0515 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 16, 2020 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 01/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DEBT COLLECTION -- Adds to existing law to establish the Idaho Patient Act to provide requirements for certain medical debt collections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish the Idaho Patient Act to provide requirements for certain medical debt collections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 16, 2020 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 01/01/2021
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:50 a.m. on March 12, 2020
2020-03-12HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-12SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-11HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-10HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2020-03-09Senateto House
2020-03-09SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-09SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2
2020-03-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-03-04SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-25SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2020-02-25SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-24Houseto Senate
2020-02-24HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-24HousePASSED 49-20-1
2020-02-24HouseMotion to send to Gen Ord, motion failed
2020-02-24HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders; objection
2020-02-24HouseRead Third Time in Full
2020-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-17HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2020-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback