ID H0509 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020 Session Law Chapter 334 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

VITAL STATISTICS -- Amends and adds to existing law to require certain facts on birth certificates and to provide for amendments to birth certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to require certain facts on birth certificates and to provide for amendments to birth certificates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020 Session Law Chapter 334 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on March 18, 2020
2020-03-18HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-18SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-18HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-18HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2020-03-17Senateto House
2020-03-17SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-17SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 27-6-2
2020-03-16SenateRetained on calendar
2020-03-11SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-03-10SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2020-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-27Houseto Senate
2020-02-27HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 53-16-1
2020-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback