ID H0509 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RECREATION -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding off-highway vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding off-highway vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HouseReturned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2018-03-13SenateRet’d to House
2018-03-13SenateRead third time in full -- FAILED 14-20-1
2018-03-09SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2018-03-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-05Houseto Senate
2018-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 57-11-2
2018-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 5, 2018
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback