ID H0507 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 253 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide Idaho Rotary International specialty license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide Idaho Rotary International specialty license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 253 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-19Senateto House
2018-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-19SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 20-13-2
2018-03-16SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2018-03-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-12Houseto Senate
2018-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-12HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 37-25-8
2018-03-09HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2018-03-08HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-03-07HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-03-07HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2018-03-07HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2018-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-23HouseRetained on General Orders
2018-02-15HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback