ID H0506 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2018 Session Law Chapter 237 Effective: 03/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the registration and use of military vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the registration and use of military vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2018 Session Law Chapter 237 Effective: 03/23/2018
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on March 20, 2018
2018-03-20HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-19SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-19SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-19HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-16Houseto enrol
2018-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-16HouseRead third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 67-0-3
2018-03-15HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-14HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-03-13HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-03-13HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2018-03-09HouseReferred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation
2018-03-09HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2018-03-08Senateto House
2018-03-08SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-08SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-07SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-06SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-03-06SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2018-03-06SenateAmendments ordered printed
2018-03-06SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-02SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2018-02-22SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-21Houseto Senate
2018-02-21HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-3-1
2018-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback