ID H0504 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - U.C. to be returned to Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to enact the Quality Educator Loan Assistance Program Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to enact the Quality Educator Loan Assistance Program Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseU.C. to be returned to Education Committee
2018-02-28HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-07HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback