ID H0501 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Veto SUSTAINED by House: Ayes 29 Nays 34 Abs/Excd 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise a definition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise a definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseVeto SUSTAINED by House: Ayes 29 Nays 34 Abs/Excd 7
2018-03-27HouseReturned from Governor vetoed on March 26, 2018
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 21, 2018
2018-03-21HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-20SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-19HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-16Senateto House
2018-03-16SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-16SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 24-9-2
2018-03-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2018-03-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-07Houseto Senate
2018-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-07HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-1-3
2018-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-07HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback