ID H0499 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 283 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 283 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PERSI -- Amends existing law to provide police officer member status to emergency communications officers.
Title
Amends existing law to provide police officer member status to emergency communications officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 283 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 30-4-1 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-01 | House | PASSED 52-18-0 |
2022-03-01 | House | Motion to return to Commerce & Human Resources Committee; motion failed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2022-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2022-01-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |