ID H0496 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPOINTMENT OF AGENCY DIRECTORS -- Amends existing law to provide that the Governor shall appoint the directors of the Department of Correction, the Idaho Transportation Department and the Department of Parks and Recreation, all of whom shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the Governor shall appoint the directors of the Department of Correction, the Idaho Transportation Department and the Department of Parks and Recreation, all of whom shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2018-02-23 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0496/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0496.pdf |