ID H0494 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IMMUNIZATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding certain notification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding certain notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2018-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-26Houseto Senate
2018-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-13-3
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-06HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback