ID H0494 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IMMUNIZATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding certain notification.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding certain notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-26 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-26 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-13-3 |
2018-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |