ID H0487 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding responsibility for costs of commitment and care of patients for mental health treatment.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding responsibility for costs of commitment and care of patients for mental health treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-22 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to House | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-12 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-03-12 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-12 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-09 | to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-09 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2012-03-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-08 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-07 | to printing | |
2012-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-07 | House intro |