ID H0486 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE HISTORICAL SOCIETY -- Amends existing law to revise a definition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise a definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on March 14, 2018
2018-03-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-14SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-14SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-13HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-12HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-09Senateto House
2018-03-09SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-09SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3
2018-03-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-02-28SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-27Houseto Senate
2018-02-27HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2018-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-06HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback