ID H0484 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
URBAN RENEWAL -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding revenue allocation areas and highway district levies.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding revenue allocation areas and highway district levies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 2, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0484/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0484.pdf |