ID H0484 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 54 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 54 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to remove reference to the limitation for successive years on a board of Community Guardian.
Title
Amends existing law to remove reference to the limitation for successive years on a board of Community Guardian.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 54 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/09 | |
2012-03-09 | To Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-07 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-06 | To enrol | |
2012-03-05 | to House | |
2012-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-24 | to Jud | |
2012-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-24 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-23 | to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2012-02-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-21 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-21 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-21 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-08 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-07 | to printing | |
2012-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-07 | House intro |