ID H0480 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2022 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2022 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
USE TAX -- Amends existing law to clarify that the use tax exemption for personally owned vehicles applies to individuals and to grantor trusts.
Title
Amends existing law to clarify that the use tax exemption for personally owned vehicles applies to individuals and to grantor trusts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2022 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2020 |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on March 4, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-2-2 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-09 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2022-02-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 7, 2022 |
2022-02-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |